Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023