Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024