03/13/2024 | Act 368 | |||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Hopper | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Senate Prefiled |