Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 4, 2024