House | 03/28/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Hopper |