Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023