05/01/2024 | Act 507 | |||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Conference Committee Appointed 120th, 104th, 71st | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 29th, 18th, 51st | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Insisted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate Hopper |