Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB63 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2024
Bill March 29, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023