LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Georgia GA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB92
Draft Versions
GA
Georgia Senate Bill SB92
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session
Georgia Senate Bill SB92
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 27, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 2, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 2, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 23, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 24, 2023
Compare