Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 3:50PM in conference room CR 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 3:31PM in conference room CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Moriwaki, Gabbard Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 684) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Keohokalole, Kim, Moriwaki. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Re-Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to WTL, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 123).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|