Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021