Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Yamane, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1979-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HSG/HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1354-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHH on Friday, 03-18-22 11:10AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG/HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2039) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to HMS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|