Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022