House | 03/10/2022 | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 280) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2741) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |