House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 139, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 139, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 6:10PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Perruso Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1766-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-18-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-19-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-17-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-10-21 10:10AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|