Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022
Bill February 19, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021