Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB339 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-THE SENATE S.B. NO. 339 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 S.D. 2 STATE OF HAWAII H.D. 1 C.D. 1 A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE IMPORTANT AGRICULTURAL LAND QUALIFIED AGRICULTURAL COST TAX CREDIT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+THE SENATE S.B. NO. 339 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 S.D. 2 STATE OF HAWAII H.D. 1 A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE IMPORTANT AGRICULTURAL LAND QUALIFIED AGRICULTURAL COST TAX CREDIT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 339
44 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021 S.D. 2
55 STATE OF HAWAII H.D. 1
6- C.D. 1
76
87 THE SENATE
98
109 S.B. NO.
1110
1211 339
1312
1413 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2021
1514
1615 S.D. 2
1716
1817 STATE OF HAWAII
1918
2019 H.D. 1
2120
2221
2322
24-C.D. 1
23+
2524
2625
2726
2827
2928
3029
3130
3231 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3332
3433
3534
3635
3736
3837 RELATING TO THE IMPORTANT AGRICULTURAL LAND QUALIFIED AGRICULTURAL COST TAX CREDIT.
3938
4039
4140
4241
4342
4443 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4544
4645
4746
48- SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit supports food self-sufficiency by providing tax credits to qualified landowners and farmers to help offset costs related to establishing and sustaining viable agricultural operations; however, under existing law, the department of agriculture must cease certifying these tax credits for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021. The legislature further finds that extending the tax credit will provide additional time to landowners and farmers to claim the tax credit in the event that their agricultural lands are identified as potential important agricultural lands and subsequently designated as such by the land use commission. The purpose of this Act is to extend the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. SECTION 2. Section 235-110.93, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (l) to read as follows: "(l) The department of agriculture shall cease certifying credits pursuant to this section for taxable years beginning after December 31, [2021;] 2030; provided that a taxpayer with accumulated, but unclaimed, certified credits may continue claiming the credits in subsequent taxable years until exhausted." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022, and shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
47+ SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit supports food self-sufficiency by providing tax credits to qualified landowners and farmers to help offset costs related to establishing and sustaining viable agricultural operations; however, under existing law, the department of agriculture must cease certifying these tax credits for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021. The legislature further finds that extending the tax credit will provide additional time to landowners and farmers to claim the tax credit in the event that their agricultural lands are identified as potential important agricultural lands and subsequently designated as such by the land use commission. The purpose of this Act is to extend the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. SECTION 2. Section 235-110.93, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (l) to read as follows: "(l) The department of agriculture shall cease certifying credits pursuant to this section for taxable years beginning after December 31, [2021;] 2030; provided that a taxpayer with accumulated, but unclaimed, certified credits may continue claiming the credits in subsequent taxable years until exhausted." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050, and shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
4948
5049 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit supports food self-sufficiency by providing tax credits to qualified landowners and farmers to help offset costs related to establishing and sustaining viable agricultural operations; however, under existing law, the department of agriculture must cease certifying these tax credits for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021. The legislature further finds that extending the tax credit will provide additional time to landowners and farmers to claim the tax credit in the event that their agricultural lands are identified as potential important agricultural lands and subsequently designated as such by the land use commission.
5150
5251 The purpose of this Act is to extend the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available.
5352
5453 SECTION 2. Section 235-110.93, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (l) to read as follows:
5554
5655 "(l) The department of agriculture shall cease certifying credits pursuant to this section for taxable years beginning after December 31, [2021;] 2030; provided that a taxpayer with accumulated, but unclaimed, certified credits may continue claiming the credits in subsequent taxable years until exhausted."
5756
5857 SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
5958
60- SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022, and shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
59+ SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050, and shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
6160
62- Report Title: Income Taxation; Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit; Hawaii Department of Agriculture; Extension Description: Extends the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. (CD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
61+ Report Title: Income Taxation; Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit; HDOA; Extension Description: Extends the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
6362
6463
6564
6665 Report Title:
6766
68-Income Taxation; Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit; Hawaii Department of Agriculture; Extension
67+Income Taxation; Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit; HDOA; Extension
6968
7069
7170
7271 Description:
7372
74-Extends the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. (CD1)
73+Extends the period during which the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit is available. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
7574
7675
7776
7877
7978
8079
8180
8281 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.