Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022