House | 02/01/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2257. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 161. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 8:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Subcommittee: Sexton, Ingels and Judge. H.J. 94. | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 93. | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |