House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |