House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0302
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|