House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0308
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 088-019-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|