House | 06/26/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |