Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|