House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregg Johnson |