House
|
05/12/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Assigned to Gaming Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|