House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0193
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|