House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|