House
|
11/08/2023
|
Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Total Veto
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 063-034-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 039-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-014-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|