House
|
05/31/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|