House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |