House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0832
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|