House
|
08/14/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0855
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|