House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|