House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 010-005-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|