House | 04/30/2024 | Resolution Adopted 106-000-000 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |