House
|
12/11/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 070-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Judicial Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 049-007-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|