Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|