Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |