Senate | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | To Subcommittee on Firearms | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |