Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |