Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | To Subcommittee on Special Issues | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |