Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations- Education | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |