House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|