House | 03/21/2025 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |