House
|
05/01/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing Committee; 011-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Assigned to Housing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Li Arellano, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Third Reading - Passed; 051-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|