Senate | 04/11/2025 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2025 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | To AI and Social Media | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Graciela Guzmán | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |