House | 04/17/2025 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Arrived in House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2025 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |