House
|
05/05/2025
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Resolution Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 9, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Filed with Secretary
|
|
|