Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 65
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 81, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Representatives Lehman and Andrade M added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Clere
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Ziemke
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Becker added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Messmer added as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Becker removed as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Messmer removed as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Senators Becker and Messmer
|
|
|